Global Patent Index - EP 0974533 A1

EP 0974533 A1 2000-01-26 - Invertible fluid dispenser

Title (en)

Invertible fluid dispenser

Title (de)

Umkehrbarer Spender für Fluide

Title (fr)

Distributeur de fluide renversable

Publication

EP 0974533 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401835 A

Priority

FR 9809411 A

Abstract (en)

The dispensing valve for a liquid container has a feed chamber (15) with upper and lower openings controlled by upper (27) And lower (13) valves. The lower valve has a floating closure (3) with a lower density than the contained liquid to close the chamber when the container is filled with fluid.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif permettant le fonctionnement, aussi bien en position renversée qu'en position droite, d'un distributeur de produit fluide comprenant un réservoir de produit fluide, et un organe de distribution (5), doté d'une entrée (55) et d'un tube plongeur (16), ledit dispositif comprend une chambré (15) en communication avec ladite entrée (55) de l'organe de distribution (5), ladite chambre comprenant deux entrées haute (25) et basse (17) sélectivement obturables par des clapets haut (4, 27) et bas (3, 13) respectifs, le clapet haut comprenant un élément de clapet mobile (4) adapté à obturer l'entrée haute (25) de la chambre (15) en position droite, caractérisé en ce que le clapet bas comprend un élément de clapet mobile flottant (3) d'une densité inférieure à celle du produit fluide adapté à obturer l'entrée basse (17) de la chambre (15) en position renversée lorsque la chambre est remplie de produit fluide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/36 (2013.01); B05B 11/0059 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2627708 A1 19890901 - VALOIS SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974533 A1 20000126; FR 2781467 A1 20000128; FR 2781467 B1 20001006; US 6186372 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025296

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI