Global Patent Index - EP 0974543 A1

EP 0974543 A1 2000-01-26 - Method and device for forming stacks of sheets

Title (en)

Method and device for forming stacks of sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Bildung von Stapeln aus Bogen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la formation de piles de feuilles

Publication

EP 0974543 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810700 A

Priority

EP 98810700 A

Abstract (en)

Sheets (1) are continuously fed from a process to form a stack on a table (4) until a predetermined height is reached when a first arm (55) is moved to hold following sheets whilst telescopic supports (18) are inserted beneath the stack. The table (4) is lowered to enable removal of the stack of sheets after which is raised to enable the supports (18) to be withdrawn.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Bildung von Stapeln (7) aus gefalzten oder ungefalzten Bogen (1) aus Papier, werden die Bogen (1) kontinuierlich in regelmässigen Abständen über eine die Bogenzahl eines zu bildenden Stapels (7) erfassende Auslage einem rechnergesteuerten Stapeltisch (4) zugeführt, wobei ein über einen mit der Auslage verbundenen Rechner gesteuerter Bogenrückhalter (10) gegen einen oberen Randbereich eines bestimmten Stapels (7) angestellt wird, derart, dass die nachfolgenden, auf den Bogenrückhalter (10) auflaufenden Bogen (1) mit dem Stapel einen Trennspalt bilden, in den zur Freistellung des Stapels (7) eine die an dem Bogenrückhalter (10) aufgenommenen Bogen (1) aufnehmende, rechnergesteuerte Trennvorrichtung (11) eingestossen wird. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/32 (2013.01); B65H 2402/343 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974543 A1 20000126; EP 0974543 B1 20031210; AT 256071 T 20031215; DE 59810407 D1 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810407

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT;HOFACHER 1;5425 SCHNEISINGEN (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-06-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GERHARD, KURT

2004-04-21 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERHARD, KURT

2004-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-03-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810407 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-05-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR FORMING STACKS OF SHEETS

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI