Global Patent Index - EP 0974544 A1

EP 0974544 A1 2000-01-26 - Apparatus for winding and unwinding a hose

Title (en)

Apparatus for winding and unwinding a hose

Title (de)

Schlauchauf- und Abwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement et de déroulement pour tuyau flexible

Publication

EP 0974544 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420168 A

Priority

FR 9809440 A

Abstract (en)

The reel for an aircraft fuel filler hose has a drive gear for rotation formed from a toothed ring (30) attached to the outer annular section (25a) of a roller (25) attached to the reel hub. The radial spokes of the reel can be detachably mounted on the hub.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif (4) comprend un dévidoir (3) formé d'un moyeu (10) qui est constitué par une pièce de fonderie et de deux jantes (11) reliées à ce moyeu (10) par l'intermédiaire de branches radiales (20), le moyeu (10) étant solidaire d'une couronne dentée, coaxiale à lui-même, servant à l'entraînement en rotation du dévidoir (3). Selon l'invention, la couronne dentée (30) est aménagée ou montée directement sur le moyeu (10), et les branches radiales (20) d'au moins une des jantes (11) du dévidoir (3) sont montées de manière amovible sur ce moyeu (10). Dispositif en particulier utilisable pour l'enroulement d'un tuyau permettant d'approvisionner un avion en carburant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/425 (2013.01); B65H 75/4478 (2013.01); B65H 75/4486 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974544 A1 20000126; FR 2781472 A1 20000128; FR 2781472 B1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000508;LV PAYMENT 20000508;SI PAYMENT 20000508

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI