Global Patent Index - EP 0974549 A1

EP 0974549 A1 2000-01-26 - Safety belt for riders on horseback

Title (en)

Safety belt for riders on horseback

Title (de)

Sicherheitsgurt für Reiter

Title (fr)

Ceinture de sécurité pour cavalier

Publication

EP 0974549 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830387 A

Priority

IT VI980123 A

Abstract (en)

Safety device for keeping a rider fastened to the saddle of a horse and allowing his natural movement, comprising two winders/unwinders (21, 22) of safety belts fastened to the saddle. The end parts of said safety belts are fastened to a band (30) tied around the rider's waist and provided with a quick clasping/releasing device (31) and with an emergency device (40) for automatic release of said band, which is controlled by at least one sensor (50) which is fastened to the saddle and/or to the rider's back. Said sensor emits a signal suitable for allowing the immediate opening of said emergency device when the horse inclines its back beyond a certain predetermined angle with respect to the horizontal for a predetermined time period and/or when the rider inclines his back beyond predetermined angles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974549 A1 20000126; IT VI980123 A1 19991224

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020411

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI