Global patent index - EP 0974642 A1

EP 0974642 A1 2000-01-26 - 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane-based cleaning and drying compositions

Title (en)

1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane-based cleaning and drying compositions

Title (de)

Reinigungs- und Trocknungsmittel auf Basis von 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-Decafluorpentan

Title (fr)

Compositions de nettoyage ou de séchage à base de 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-décafluoropentane

Publication

EP 0974642 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401419 A

Priority

FR 9809464 A

Abstract (en)

The compound is a satisfactory replacement for 1.1.2-trichloro-1,2,2-trifluoroethane (F 113) which has been widely used for cleaning and degreasing, but is now banned due to its suspected degradative action on the ozone layer. The azeotropic or quasi azeotropic compositions comprise 1 - 25% of 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane (43-10 mee) and 75 - 99% of 1,1,1,3,3-penta-fluorobutane (F 365 mfc), preferably 80 - 95%. This gives a boiling point of 36.5 degrees C. at atmospheric pressure. An Independent claim is also included for the use of these compositions.

Abstract (fr)

Pour remplacer les compositions à base de CFC ou de HCFC dans les applications de nettoyage ou de séchage de surfaces solides (notamment défluxage), l'invention propose des compositions azéotropiques ou quasi azéotropiques à base de 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-décafluoropentane, de 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane, et éventuellement de méthanol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 7/50; C23G 5/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/50 (2006.01); C23G 5/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/505 (2013.01); C23G 5/02803 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0653484 A1
  • [AD] EP 0512885 A1
  • [A] WO 9739080 A1
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 9328 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E19, AN 93-224471 XP002012038 & JP 05 148498 A (DAIKIN KOGYO KK), 15 juin 1993 (1993-06-15)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 9412 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E16, AN 94-094976 XP002049890 & JP 06 041591 A (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD), 15 février 1994 (1994-02-15)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974642 A1 20000126; EP 0974642 B1 20030903; DE 69910916 D1 20031009; DE 69910916 T2 20040715; ES 2207140 T3 20040516; FR 2781499 A1 20000128; FR 2781499 B1 20000908; US 6174850 B1 20010116; US RE39819 E1 20070904

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160608

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207140

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69910916

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031009

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-DECAFLUOROPENTANE AND 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROBUTANE-BASED CLEANING AND DRYING COMPOSITIONS

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOFINA

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990628

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI