Global patent index - EP 0974653 A2

EP 0974653 A2 2000-01-26 - Human gastric cancer antigen gene and protein

Title (en)

Human gastric cancer antigen gene and protein

Title (de)

Menschliches Gen und Protein eines Magenkrebs-Antigens

Title (fr)

Gène et protéine humaine d'un antigène du cancer de l'estomac

Publication

EP 0974653 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305469 A

Priority

JP 19785298 A

Abstract (en)

A tumor antigen gene is identified by screening a cDNA library derived from a gastric cancer cell line that can induce gastric cancer antigen specific cytotoxic T cell (CTL) by means of hybridization and PCR utilizing an amino acid sequence of peptide fragment of a known gastric cancer antigen protein, introducing a selected cDNA clone into a cell of gastric cancer cell line that cannot induce gastric cancer antigen specific CTL so that the clone should be expressed in the cell, and selecting a transgenic cell that has acquired the ability to induce CTL. According to the present invention, there are provided a protein capable of inducing immune response against human gastric cancer, DNA encoding the protein, as well as vaccine for treatment and prevention of human gastric cancer, and agent for treatment and prevention of human gastric cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 7/06; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/02 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/82 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4748 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] EP 0770624 A2
  • [E] WO 0055350 A1
  • [E] US 6132973 A
  • [AD] YASOSHIMA TAKAHIRO ET AL: "The mechanism of the human autologous gastric signet ring cell tumor rejection by cytotoxic T lymphocytes in the possible context of HLA-A31 molecule." CANCER (PHILADELPHIA), vol. 75, no. 6 SUPPL., 1995, pages 1484-1489, XP001015517 ISSN: 0008-543X
  • [A] SHU QIN LIU ET AL: "INDUCTION OF HUMAN AUTOLOGOUS CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES ON FORMALIN-FIXED AND PARAFFIN-EMBEDDED TUMOUR SECTIONS" NATURE MEDICINE, vol. 1, no. 3, 1 March 1995 (1995-03-01), pages 267-271, XP002050775 ISSN: 1078-8956
  • [T] SATO NORIYUKI ET AL: "Natural antigenic properties of gastric signet ring cell carcinomas." GANN MONOGRAPH ON CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 48, 1999, pages 31-41, XP001015519 ISBN: 3-8055-6980-7

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974653 A2 20000126; EP 0974653 A3 20010919; EP 0974653 B1 20050914; AT 304593 T 20050915; DE 69927214 D1 20051020; DE 69927214 T2 20060706; JP 2000023673 A 20000125; US 2002173642 A1 20021121; US 6444800 B1 20020903; US 7030222 B2 20060418

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060709

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070709

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070709

2007-04-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2006-02-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-12-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051225

2005-12-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69927214

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051020

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMURO, JUNJI,C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIKUCHI, KOKICHI

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAHARA, HIROEKI

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SATO, NORIYUKI

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, MANABU,C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2005-08-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TORIGOE, TOSHIHIKO

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020104

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI