Global patent index - EP 0974673 A1

EP 0974673 A1 2000-01-26 - Method for the desulfurization of molten pig iron

Title (en)

Method for the desulfurization of molten pig iron

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entschwefeln einer Roheisenschmelze

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la désulfuration de la fonte liquide

Publication

EP 0974673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106651 A

Priority

DE 19833037 A

Abstract (en)

Molten pig iron is desulfurized by co-injecting a desulfurizing agent at a decreasing injection rate and a gas-evolving carbonaceous additive at an increasing injection rate. Molten pig iron desulfurization comprises co-injecting separately supplied desulfurizing agent and gas-evolving carbonaceous additive into the melt, the injection rate of the desulfurizing agent being higher at the beginning than at the end and the injection rate of the additive being lower at the beginning than at the end. Preferred Features: The injection rate of the desulfurizing agent (CaC2 and/or CaO) is decreased continuously or in steps from 80-200 kg/min. to 5-25 kg/min. at the end, while the injection rate of the additive (gas coal, flame coal or hydrocarbons) is increased continuously or in steps from 1-5 kg/min. to 6-20 kg/min.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Entschwefeln einer Roheisenschmelze, in die Entschwefelungsmittel und gasabspaltender Zusatzstoff eingeblasen werden. Um gegenüber bekannten Verfahren den Verbrauch an Entschwefelungsmitteln zu verringern und den Wirkungsgrad der Entschwefelung zu erhöhen, wird vorgeschlagen, das Entschwefelungsmittel und den Zusatzstoff getrennt heranzufördern und zumindest über den größten Teil der Behandlungszeit gemeinsam in das Roheisen-Schmelzebad einzublasen, wobei die Einblasrate des Entschwefelungsmittels zu Beginn der Einblasrate höher ist als am Ende, während die Einblasrate des Zusatzstoffes zu Beginn der Einblasphase niedriger ist als am Ende.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/025 (2013.01); C21C 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974673 A1 20000126; EP 0974673 B1 20050309; AT 290611 T 20050315; DE 19833037 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 08

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRUPP POLYSIUS A.G.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-04-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070403

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-03-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-02-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911720

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050414

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI