Global patent index - EP 0974674 A1

EP 0974674 A1 2000-01-26 - Method for desulferization of molten pig iron

Title (en)

Method for desulferization of molten pig iron

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entschwefeln einer Roheisenschmelze

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la désulfuration de la fonte liquide

Publication

EP 0974674 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106652 A

Priority

DE 19833036 A

Abstract (en)

Molten pig iron is desulfurized by injection of a high reducing additive content agent under conditions which take thermodynamic and reaction kinetics requirements into account. Preferred Features: The parameters are a relatively high ratio of the agent injection rate to the transport gas rate, a relatively high specific total gas quantity and a relatively high ratio of evolved gas quantity to transport gas quantity. The agent comprises (by wt.) 30-72 CaC2, 15-62% CaO and 8-20% gas-evolving additive, especially gas coal, flame coal, plastic or other hydrocarbon which evolves reducing gases at pig iron temperatures of 1150-1500 degrees C.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befaßt sich mit einem Verfahren zum Entschwefeln einer Roheisenschmelze, bei dem ein Schmelzebehandlungsmittel mit Hilfe eines Transportgases in ein Roheisen-Schmelzebad eingeblasen wird. Um relativ kurze Einblaszeiten bei vergleichsweise geringen Entschwefelungsmittelkosten erzielen zu können, wird das Schmelzebehandlungsmittel mit einem relativ hohen Anteil an reduzierend wirkendem, gasabspaltendem Zusatzstoff verwendet und das Einblasen dieses Schmelzbehandlungsmittels bei Kombination von thermodynamische und reaktionskinetische Erfordernisse berücksichtigenden Verfahrensparametern durchgeführt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 1/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974674 A1 20000126; EP 0974674 B1 20041006; AT 278810 T 20041015; DE 19833036 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150402

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140519

2014-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2014-05-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP RESOURCE TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP RESOURCE TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RECHTSANW. UND PAT.-ANW. DR.-ING. DR.JUR. VOLK, DE

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RECHTSANW. UND PAT.-ANW. DR.-ING. DR.JUR. VOLK, DE

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-06-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RECHTSANW. UND PAT.-ANW. DR.-ING. DR.JUR. VOLK, DE

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP RESOURCE TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP RESOURCE TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RECHTSANW. UND PAT.-ANW. DR.-ING. DR.JUR. VOLK, DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TETZNER & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RA U. PA VOLKMAR TETZNER; PA MICHAEL TETZNER; , DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-05-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910702

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POLYSIUS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030212

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI