Global patent index - EP 0974678 A1

EP 0974678 A1 2000-01-26 - Process and steel for the manufacturing of welded vessels, intended for use in the presence of hydrogen sulphide

Title (en)

Process and steel for the manufacturing of welded vessels, intended for use in the presence of hydrogen sulphide

Title (de)

Verfahren und Stahl für die Herstellung von geschweissten Behältern, bestimmt zur Verwendung in Gegenwart von Schwefelwasserstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé et acier pour la fabrication d'une enceinte chaudronnée, travaillant en présence d'hydrogène sulfuré

Publication

EP 0974678 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401632 A

Priority

FR 9809271 A

Abstract (en)

Steel components of the boiler enclosure are manufactured and comprise (in wt.%): 0.03-0.15 C, 0-0.5 Si, 0.4-2.5 Mn, 0.5-3 Ni, 0-1 Cr, 0-0.5 Mo, 0-0.07 Al, 0-0.04 Ti, 0-0.004 B, 0-0.02 V, 0-0.05 Nb, below 1 Cu, below 0.015 S, and below 0.03 P. Manufacturing a boiler enclosure to work under pressure between -40-200 degrees C with cracking risks under stress generated by H2S as defined by the standard specification NACE MR 0175-97 comprises manufacturing steel components of the boiler enclosure comprising (in wt.%): 0.03-0.15 C, 0-0.5 Si, 0.4-2.5 Mn, 0.5-3 Ni, 0-1 Cr, 0-0.5 Mo, 0-0.07 Al, 0-0.04 Ti, 0-0.004 B, 0-0.02 V, 0-0.05 Nb, below 1 Cu, below 0.015 S, and below 0.03 P. The chemical composition is CET = C+ (Mn+Mo)/10 + (Cr+Cu)/20 + Ni/40 below 0.35 and the critical cooling time between 800 degrees C and 500 degrees C: cct 800/500 is below 10 s. The components are quenched and tempered, after or before forming, in order to obtain a martensitic or a martensitic-bainitic structure comprising less than 10 % ferrite. After forming the components, they are relaxed at a temperature above 595 degrees C, the components are welded with an energy and pre-heating conditions such that the cooling time ct 800/500 between 800 and 500 degrees C of the heated zone is above 5 s. A post-welding thermal treatment is performed at a temperature Tpw above 595 degrees C and below 680 degrees C. The obtained steel has a tensile strength above 550 Mpa, a yield strength above 450 MPa, an elongation above 17 % and an impact strength at -40 degrees C above 40 Joules, and hardness everywhere on the surface of the enclosure below 248 HV. Independent claims are also included for (1) a boiler enclosure manufactured as above, and (2) a steel for manufacturing boiler enclosure.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une enceinte chaudronnée destinée à travailler sous pression entre - 40 °C et 200 °C en présence d'H2S dans les conditions définies par la norme NACE MR 0175-97 selon lequel : on fabrique des composants de l'enceinte en acier de composition chimique : 0,03 % <= C <= 0,15 % ; 0 % <= Si <= 0,5 % ; 0,4 % <= Mn <= 2,5 % ; 0,5 % <= Ni <= 3 % ; 0 % <= Cr <= 1 % ; 0 % <= Mo <= 0,5 % ; 0 % <= Al <= 0,07 % ; 0 % <= Ti <= 0,04 % ; 0 % <= B <= 0,004 % ; 0 % <= V <= 0,02 % ; 0 % <= Nb <= 0,05 % ; Cu <= 1 % ; S <= 0,015 % ; P <= 0,03 % ; le reste étant du fer et des impuretés résultant de l'élaboration ; CET = C + (Mn + Mo)/10 + (Cr + Cu)/20 + Ni/40 <= 0,35 ; trc 800/500 <= 10 s ; les composants étant trempés et revenus ; la structure est martensitique ou martensito-bainitique avec moins de 10 % de ferrite; la température de revenu est < 680°C. On effectue éventuellement un détensionnement à une température >= 595°C. On soude les composants dans des conditions telles que le temps de refroidissement tr entre 800 °C et 500 °C de la ZAC soit > 5 secondes, et on effectue un traitement thermique post-soudage entre 595°C et 680°C, l'acier étant tel que Rm >= 550 MPa, Re >= 450 MPa, A % >= 17 %, KCV >= 40 J à - 40°C, et la dureté en tous points de la surface de l'enceinte est <= 248 HV. Enceinte obtenue et acier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/04; C22C 38/08; C22C 38/44; C22C 38/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 9/23 (2006.01); B01J 3/04 (2006.01); B23K 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/08 (2006.01); C21D 9/50 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/50 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/58 (2013.01); C21D 2211/002 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 3110635 A
  • [Y] US 3110586 A
  • [Y] GB 1020572 A
  • [Y] GB 1542503 A
  • [Y] GB 1034424 A
  • [Y] GB 987184 A
  • [Y] US 2586042 A
  • [A] SU 553305 A1
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 007, 31 août 1995 (1995-08-31) & JP 07 109520 A (NIPPON STEEL CORP.), 25 avril 1995 (1995-04-25)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 589 (C-1124), 27 octobre 1993 (1993-10-27) & JP 05 171343 A (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.), 9 juillet 1993 (1993-07-09)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 008, 29 septembre 1995 (1995-09-29) & JP 07 113140 A (KOBE STEEL LTD.), 2 mai 1995 (1995-05-02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974678 A1 20000126; EP 0974678 B1 20040428; AT 265553 T 20040515; CA 2278407 A1 20000121; DE 69916717 D1 20040603; DE 69916717 T2 20050504; ES 2220020 T3 20041201; FR 2781506 A1 20000128; FR 2781506 B1 20000825; JP 2000054026 A 20000222; KR 20000011781 A 20000225; US 6322642 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2220020

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

2004-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-08-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69916717

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040603

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE)

2002-10-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF WELDED VESSELS, INTENDED FOR USE IN THE PRESENCE OF HYDROGEN SULPHIDE

2002-10-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF WELDED VESSELS, INTENDED FOR USE IN THE PRESENCE OF HYDROGEN SULPHIDE

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI