Global patent index - EP 0974680 A1

EP 0974680 A1 2000-01-26 - Process for the electrolytic production of cyanide in nitrocarburizing molten baths

Title (en)

Process for the electrolytic production of cyanide in nitrocarburizing molten baths

Title (de)

Verfahren zur elektrolytischen Erzeugung von Cyanid in Nitrocarburierschmelzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de cyanure dans des bains fondus de nitrocarburation

Publication

EP 0974680 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112333 A

Priority

DE 19832404 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832404C1] Cyanide is produced from nitrocarburised melts containing cyanate by electrolyzing the melt.

Abstract (de)

Zur Verkürzung der Wartezeiten bis zur Einstellung des Gleichgewichtes zwischen Cyanat und Cyanid und zur Einschränkung der Verwendung cyanidhaltiger Stoffe und Produkte für die Nitrocarburierung in Salzschmelzen werden Schmelzen, die nur Cyanat und gegebenenfalls Carbonat enthalten, mit einer Stromdichte von 4 bis 100 A/dm<2>-Elektrodenfläche zur Bildung eines vorteilhaften Cyanidgehaltes von 1 bis 5 Gew.% elektrolysiert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/54 (2006.01); C25B 1/00 (2006.01); C25B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/54 (2013.01); C25B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 2708623 A1
  • [A] DE 1255438 B
  • [A] KOSHELEV A T: "INTENSIFICATION OF THE CARBONITRIDING PROCESS WITH THE AID OF DC" METAL SCIENCE AND HEAT TREATMENT, Bd. 32, Nr. 11 / 12, 1. November 1990 (1990-11-01), Seiten 918-921, XP000261572 ISSN: 0026-0673

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832404 C1 19991021; AT 225869 T 20021015; BR 9902971 A 20000425; CA 2277495 A1 20000118; EP 0974680 A1 20000126; EP 0974680 B1 20021009; ES 2183462 T3 20030316; JP 2000054109 A 20000222; TR 9901661 A2 20000221; US 6159355 A 20001212; ZA 9904621 B 20000114

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090627

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Country Code: HK

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025133

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-03-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030603

- Year of fee payment: 05

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2183462

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59902998

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021114

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 225869

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20021015

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DURFERRIT GMBH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUDIS, ULRICH, DR.

2000-02-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOOSE, MANDY

2000-02-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PRIETZEL, KARL-OTTO, PROF.

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI