Global Patent Index - EP 0974687 A1

EP 0974687 A1 2000-01-26 - Fibre processing apparatus

Title (en)

Fibre processing apparatus

Title (de)

Faserverarbeitende Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le traitement de fibres

Publication

EP 0974687 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305502 A

Priority

GB 9815582 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for use in processing of fibres, comprising a number of pins 23 mounted in bores 22 in a body 21, the body interlocking with a support formed of a plurality of pieces 25, 26, such that a central channel 27 is formed by the body and the support in combination. The support interlocks with the body by means of ribs 24, 28, 29, 30 extending from the body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/24; D01G 15/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/24 (2006.01); D01G 15/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/92 (2013.01); D01G 15/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2323099 A 19980916 - STEWART & SONS WM R [GB]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974687 A1 20000126; GB 2340848 A 20000301; GB 9815582 D0 19980916; GB 9916107 D0 19990908

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J & D WILKIE (HOLDING COMPANY) LIMITED

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI