Global Patent Index - EP 0974688 A1

EP 0974688 A1 2000-01-26 - Extracting belt guide of a combing machine

Title (en)

Extracting belt guide of a combing machine

Title (de)

Führungsvorrichtung des Abreissriemens einer Kämmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage du manchon d'arrachage d'une peigneuse rectiligne

Publication

EP 0974688 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440210 A

Priority

FR 9809588 A

Abstract (en)

The guide mechanism for the drawing-off apron in a rectilinear combing machine has one additional deflection cylinder (7). The lower (4) and upper (8) drawing-off cylinders are fixed to the moving carrier (1). At least one initial deflection cylinder (5) and the funnel (10) are mounted to the machine frame (2). At least two deflection cylinders (5,6) and the funnel (10) are locked to the machine frame (2), while a third deflection cylinder (7) is locked to the moving carrier (1). The deflection cylinder (7) at the carrier (1) is placed near the deflection cylinder (6) mounted to the frame (2) and, in operation, is at a gap from the pivot point (1') of the moving carrier (1) which is smaller than the gap between the deflection cylinder (6) at the frame (2) and the carrier swing point (1'), and which is larger than the gap between the drawing-off cylinders (4,8) and the deflection cylinder (6) at the frame (2). All the deflection cylinders (5-7) can be mounted to the machine frame (2), where at least one cylinder (7) is on a spring mounting. The spring mounting is an oscillating arm, which pivots at one end on the frame (2), with the deflection cylinder (7) at the other end and held by a return spring. Its swing movement is through a connecting rod linked to the carrier (1) with an adjustment to the amplitude of the swing movements. The connecting rod has a length adjustment setting, or it can be an adjustable piston with a slide connection to the carrier. The spring mounting can also be a slide which supports the deflection cylinder (7), operated by a compression spring. The reciprocating movement of the carrier (1) can be through a cam system. A stripper cylinder (9) is on the frame (2), between the funnel (10) and the end of the drawing-off apron (3).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de guidage du manchon d'arrachage d'une peigneuse rectiligne. comportant un chariot (1) mobile par rapport au bâti (2) de la machine, un manchon d'arrachage (3) tendu entre un cylindre arracheur inférieur (4) et au moins un premier cylindre de détour (5). au moins un cylindre arracheur supérieur (8) coopérant, en outre, avec le cylindre arracheur inférieur (4), et un entonnoir (10) monté en aval du manchon d'arrachage (3). Dispositif, caractérisé en ce que seul un cylindre de détour (7) supplémentaire et les cylindres arracheurs inférieur (4) et supérieur (8) sont solidarisés avec le chariot mobile (1), au moins le premier cylindre de détour (5) et l'entonnoir (10) étant solidarisés avec le bâti (2) de la machine. L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine de l'industrie textile, en particulier des peigneuses rectilignes <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/18; D01G 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/18 (2006.01); D01G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2013.01); D01G 19/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974688 A1 20000126; EP 0974688 B1 20030312; DE 69905808 D1 20030417; FR 2781507 A1 20000128; FR 2781507 B1 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905808 P 20030417

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES IT LI

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI