Global Patent Index - EP 0974691 A2

EP 0974691 A2 2000-01-26 - Method for making knitwear

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot

Publication

EP 0974691 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113757 A

Priority

DE 19833392 A

Abstract (en)

Both the main component (2) and the part component (3) are knitted in parallel up to the point where the part component is complete and the main component has reached the joint position. Only every other needle is used in each bed so that the join can be made by transferring stitches between beds on to the empty needles opposite.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks mit einem räumlichen Hauptgestrickelement (2) und mindestens einem räumlichen Teilgestrickelement (3) auf einer Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens zwei gegenüberliegenden Nadelbetten, wobei das Hauptgestrickelement (2) und das mindestens eine Teilgestrickelement (3) parallel auf der Maschine gefertigt werden, bis das mindestens eine Teilgestrickelement (3) fertiggestellt und beim Hauptgestrickelement (2) die Stelle der Ankopplung des mindestens einen Teilgestrickelements (3) erreicht ist, und dann das mindestens eine Teilgestrickelement (3) mittels einer Umhänge-Ketteltechnik auf der Maschine an das Hauptgestrickelement (2) angestrickt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D04B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/28 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0333 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974691 A2 20000126; EP 0974691 A3 20000927; EP 0974691 B1 20040901; DE 19833392 A1 20000127; ES 2224504 T3 20050301; US 6216494 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070714

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060715

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224504 T3

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910378 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ESSIG, HORST

2004-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOGT, OLIVER

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021118

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI