Global patent index - EP 0974692 A2

EP 0974692 A2 2000-01-26 - Needle selecting apparatus for circular knitting machines

Title (en)

Needle selecting apparatus for circular knitting machines

Title (de)

Nadelauswahlvorrichtung für Rundstrickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sélection d'aiguilles pour des machines à tricoter circulaires

Publication

EP 0974692 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305838 A

Priority

JP 20755198 A

Abstract (en)

A circular knitting machine (20) comprises rotary needle cylinder, knitting needles, spring jacks, selector jacks (24) and a multi-tier electrically controlled needle selecting device (30). The needle selecting device (30) includes piezoelectric elements (32) and pattern fingers (33) for selecting and causing the selector jacks (24) control the movement of the needles (22) between welt, tuck and knit positions. A pre-pusher cam (34) is provided paritally to push the selector jacks (24) inwardly before these selector jacks are engaged by the pattern fingers (33) which increases the range of selection and permits increased speed in fine gauge knitting machines (24 gauge and higher) and which permits a reduction in the number of piezoelectric elements in coarse gauge machines and the inclusion of an interlock jacquard apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/82 (2006.01); D04B 15/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/78 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974692 A2 20000126; EP 0974692 A3 20001025; JP 2000045156 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030620

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI