Global patent index - EP 0974693 A1

EP 0974693 A1 2000-01-26 - Heat setting of fabrics

Title (en)

Heat setting of fabrics

Title (de)

Thermische Fixierung von Textilbahnen

Title (fr)

Fixage thermique des étoffes textiles

Publication

EP 0974693 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305504 A

Priority

GB 9815965 A

Abstract (en)

A woven or spiral link papermaking fabric (1) is passed through an oven (11) wherein at least one side is subjected to microwave radiation from a microwave radiation emitting device (13) which is powered by a magnetron (14) which is adapted to operate at a frequency of from 100MHz to 300GHz with impedance mismatch and frequency offset between the magnetron (14) and emitting device (13) being controlled to prevent a thermal runaway. The fabric may be of microwave absorbent fibres or yarns or of fibres or yarns including a microwave absorbent additive such as titania. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 7/02; D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3596372 A
  • [AD] US 4495714 A
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 8619 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class F07, AN 1986-123340 XP002119161 -& JP 61 063764 A (HATA KOGYO K.K.), 1 April 1986 (1986-04-01)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 504 (C-653), 13 November 1989 (1989-11-13) -& JP 01 201570 A (ASHIMORI IND. CO. LTD.), 14 August 1989 (1989-08-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974693 A1 20000126; GB 9815965 D0 19980923; JP 2000054254 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010322

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH FABRICS HEIDENHEIM GMBH & CO.KG

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI