Global Patent Index - EP 0974699 A1

EP 0974699 A1 2000-01-26 - Screed for a road paver

Title (en)

Screed for a road paver

Title (de)

Einbaubohle für einen Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Poutre lisseuse pour finisseur de chaussée

Publication

EP 0974699 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113029 A

Priority

DE 19833394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833394C1] The road making vehicle has a board with two outer facing end surfaces having through openings (8,13) to receive extensions (9,26). The extension fastenings have spring stacks (14) each with an outwardly sprung piston (15) carrying a shaft (17) extending through the openings (8,13) and carrying an opposing washer and nut.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einbaubohle für einen Straßenfertiger mit zwei äußeren Seitenwänden (2, 12) wobei in mindestens einer der Seitenwände (2, 12) Durchstecköffnungen (8, 13) zum lösbaren Anbringen mindestens eines seitlichen Bohlenverlängerungsteils (9, 26) über Befestigungselemente vorgesehen sind, die durch die Durchstecköffnungen (8, 13) hindurchsteckbar sind. Hierbei umfassen die Befestigungselemente Federspeicherzylinder (14), die jeweils einen in seine Ausgangsstellung federvorgespannten Kolben (15) aufweisen, zur Verschiebung des Kolbens (15) gegen die Federvorspannung hydraulisch beaufschlagbar und hierzu an einen Hydraulikkreis der Einbaubohle anschließbar sind, wobei der Kolben (15) einen durch die jeweilige Durchstecköffnung (8, 13) hindurchsteckbaren Schaft (17) trägt, der mit einem Widerlagerelement (18) versehbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/42; F16B 21/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/22 (2006.01); E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/40 (2013.01); E01C 2301/14 (2013.01); Y10T 403/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833394 C1 19990930; CN 1106487 C 20030423; CN 1243182 A 20000202; EP 0974699 A1 20000126; EP 0974699 B1 20040331; JP 2000045219 A 20000215; JP 3155744 B2 20010416; US 6190087 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909000 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI