Global Patent Index - EP 0974702 A2

EP 0974702 A2 2000-01-26 - Automotive soil treating machine

Title (en)

Automotive soil treating machine

Title (de)

SELBSTFAHRENDE BODENBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

Machine automotrice de traitement du sol

Publication

EP 0974702 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114174 A

Priority

JP 20964798 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicular automotive soil treating machine having a main frame structure (2) provided on an automotive drive means to support thereon a soil feeding stage (3) including at least a soil hopper (20) and an additive hopper (30) for feeding soil and an additive soil improving material, a soil processing stage including a soil processing trough (60) which is internally provided with a mixing means (64, 66) for mixing soil and additive material while being transferred from one to the other end of the soil processing trough, and a processed soil discharging stage (5) including a soil discharging conveyer (73) for transferring processed soil of improved quality in a predetermined direction. The soil processing trough (60) is provided with an inlet opening on the upper side of its fore end portion to receive soil and additive material therethrough, and an outlet opening on the bottom side of its rear end portion to discharge processed soil of improved quality toward the discharging conveyer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/12 (2006.01); E02F 5/22 (2006.01); E02F 7/02 (2006.01); E02F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 7/02 (2013.01); E02F 5/226 (2013.01); E02F 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974702 A2 20000126; EP 0974702 A3 20020612; CN 1112958 C 20030702; CN 1261550 A 20000802; JP 2000045327 A 20000215; JP 3387829 B2 20030317; KR 100403753 B1 20031101; KR 20000011955 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120322

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070416

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 5/22 A, 7E 02F 7/02 B, 7E 02F 7/06 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI