Global patent index - EP 0974703 A1

EP 0974703 A1 2000-01-26 - Half-shells to replace parts of sewer channels

Title (en)

Half-shells to replace parts of sewer channels

Title (de)

Halbschalen zum partiellen Auswechseln von Entwässerungskanälen

Title (fr)

Demi-coquilles pour le remplacement partiel de canalisations

Publication

EP 0974703 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250240 A

Priority

DE 29813896 U

Abstract (en)

The device uses drainage channels to be installed which consist of prefabricated half shells (1,4) of the required length, preferably of the same shape and diameter as the original channels. The upper half shell (4) contains one or more openings (2,3). The openings can be cylindrical, conical, stepped, cornered or slotted and can be provided with or without an additional sealing element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Halbschalen zum partiellen Auswechseln von Entwässerungskanälen, die mit Einbauteilen, beispielsweise Lichtwellenleiter (LWL)-Kabel, versehen sind. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, Halbschalen anzugeben, die ein partielles Auswechseln defekter Kanalteile, in denen Einbauteile, beispielsweise LWL-Kabel, vorhanden sind, ermöglicht und gewährleistet, daß die Einbauteile danach wieder fest an der Innenwand des Kanals anliegen. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß neu einzubauende Entwässerungskanalteile aus bekannten in der benötigten Länge vorgefertigten Halbschalen (1) und (4), vorzugsweise gleicher Form und gleichen Durchmessers wie der ursprüngliche Kanal, bestehen, wobei die obere Halbschale (4) mit einer oder mehreren Öffnungen (2; 3) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/00 (2006.01); E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 11/005 (2013.01); E03F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4203719 A1 19930812 - MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813896 U1 19981022; EP 0974703 A1 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020914

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI