Global patent index - EP 0974707 A1

EP 0974707 A1 2000-01-26 - Wooden panel and profiled connecting element

Title (en)

Wooden panel and profiled connecting element

Title (de)

Holzbautafel und Abschluss-Profilelement hiefür

Title (fr)

Panneau en bois et élément de liaison

Publication

EP 0974707 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890250 A

Priority

AT 127198 A

Abstract (en)

Individual inner layers are formed with spaced apart boards and strips. The layers (10-16) are formed alternately as fully surfaced layers (10-13), with horizontal boards and strips (18) in the installed state, and with intermediate layers (14-16) provided with intermediate spaces. Counterposedly spaced vertical boards and strips (17) are in the installed state. The horizontal boards and strips of the cover layers (10,13) are joined to each other by tongued and grooved unions. In the installed state, on the vertical narrow sides of the wooden structural panel the outermost boards and strips (17) of the intermediate layers end at a distance of approximately 2 cm measured internally from the outer plane of the actual narrow side.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben werden eine Holzbautafel (1) mit mehreren untereinander verbundenen Lagen (10 bis 16), die horizontale und vertikale Bretter bzw. Leisten (17,18) aufweisen, wobei die Lagen (10 bis 16) abwechselnd als vollflächige Lagen (10 bis 13), mit im eingebauten Zustand horizontalen Brettern bzw. Leisten (18), und als mit Zwischenräumen vorgesehene Zwischenlagen (14 bis 16), mit gegenseitig beabstandeten, im eingebauten Zustand vertikalen Brettern bzw. Leisten (17), ausgebildet sind, sowie ein Profilelement (2), das den Zwischenlagen (14 bis 16) entsprechende Feder-Vorsprünge (6) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974707 A1 20000126; AT 410455 B 20030526; AT A127198 A 20020915

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000724

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI IT LI SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI