Global Patent Index - EP 0974710 A1

EP 0974710 A1 2000-01-26 - Fire prevention device

Title (en)

Fire prevention device

Title (de)

Feuerschutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de prévention d'incendie

Publication

EP 0974710 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305449 A

Priority

GB 9815768 A

Abstract (en)

A device consisting of an appropriate number of flat or curved sheets or strips of thermally conductive material (1-4) which are secured around a flue which may contain hot gases. These sheets or strips are interposed between the external surface of the flue and thermally insulating flammable material around the flue, and serve to dissipate and prevent heat being transferred to the flammable material thus protecting it from ignition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/147; E04D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 9/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1475 (2013.01); E04D 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974710 A1 20000126; GB 9815768 D0 19980916

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030327

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IE NL

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI