Global Patent Index - EP 0974711 A2

EP 0974711 A2 2000-01-26 - Building element

Title (en)

Building element

Title (de)

Bauelement

Title (fr)

Elément de construction

Publication

EP 0974711 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99610042 A

Priority

DK 9800273 U

Abstract (en)

A building element (310) is intended for sealing a hole of a foil of an underroof of a roof structure in which hole a rectangular support structure for a window frame structure having a specific configuration and specific dimensions is mounted. Through the hole access is established from the surroundings into the interior space defined below the roof structure. The building element comprises a rim part (322) defining a central rectangular aperture of a configuration and a perimeter substantially corresponding to the configuration and perimeter of the hole, and a collar part (324) integrally connected to and extending substantially perpendicular from the rim part and circumferentially encircling the mentioned central rectangular aperture. The rim part (322) and the collar part (324) of the building element are made from weather-proof materials, and the rim part (322) is adapted to be arranged in substantially co-planar relationship relative to and in facial contact with the foil of the underroof so as to arrange the central aperture (323) of the rim part in registration with the hole of the foil of the underroof and so as to arrange the collar part (324) extending upwardly from the rim part (323). The building element (310) is made from reversible water vapour transmitting plastic foils comprising a water and water vapour resistant, water impermeable and water vapour permeable barrier layer. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/147; E04D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1475 (2013.01); E04D 13/031 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974711 A2 20000126; EP 0974711 A3 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI