Global Patent Index - EP 0974712 A3

EP 0974712 A3 2000-02-23 - Roof ridge or edge ventilating element

Title (en)

Roof ridge or edge ventilating element

Title (de)

First- oder Gratentlüftungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de ventilation de faîte ou d'arête de toit

Publication

EP 0974712 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114108 A

Priority

  • DE 19832760 A
  • DE 19835002 A
  • DE 29900704 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974712A2] The placed-on strips (2a) of the middle part are fixed to a roofing or ridge slat (5). The air-permeable middle strips (2b) on each side of, and adjoining, the placed-on strips are joined to outer edge strips (10) placed on roofing. The middle part consists of a thin-walled, sheet-like length of metal or metal alloy, preferably aluminum, and the edge strips consist of a deformable length of material preferably lead. The middle and edge strips are non-flammable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/176 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974712 A2 20000126; EP 0974712 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: MK PAYMENT 20000818;SI PAYMENT 20000818

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI