Global Patent Index - EP 0974716 A2

EP 0974716 A2 2000-01-26 - Door-handle, window-handle, or sanitary elements

Title (en)

Door-handle, window-handle, or sanitary elements

Title (de)

Tür- und Fenstergriffe sowie Sanitärelemente

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte, poignée de fenêtre, ou élément sanitaire

Publication

EP 0974716 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111735 A

Priority

DE 19833263 A

Abstract (en)

A base element (9) is detachably connected by means of a snap-in fastening, consisting of a lug (13) engaging with a cavity (14), to a sleeve (8) open at least on one side, near a section (2) of the handle or element. When connected, the sleeve encloses the base element which is spring-connected to the lug. The cavity is positioned in an end of the sleeve facing away from the opening in the sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Tür- und/oder Fenstergriff und/oder Sanitärelement mit einem Abschnitt (2), bei dem zumindest im Bereich (3) des Abschnitts (2) ein Grundelement (9) mit einer zumindest einseitig offenen Hülse (8) lösbar koppelbar ist, wobei die Hülse (8) das Grundelement (9) im gekoppelten Zustand mehrseitig umgibt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/04; A47K 5/00; A47K 17/02; E03C 1/04; F16B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 1/04 (2013.01); A47K 2201/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974716 A2 20000126; EP 0974716 A3 20030122; DE 19833263 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI