Global Patent Index - EP 0974721 A3

EP 0974721 A3 2002-11-13 - Lock with several bolts

Title (en)

Lock with several bolts

Title (de)

Mehrriegelschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à plusieurs pênes

Publication

EP 0974721 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890205 A

Priority

AT 127698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974721A2] The cog wheel gear (4) is between the closing cylinder (1) and cogging at least of a slide rod operating the locking or a connecting piece on the slide rod. The especially drive cog wheel has a carrier (7) for operating a change lever (8) for pulling the catch bolt back. The end of the lever facing away from the catch bolt is near the carrier. A control surface on the slide rod or on a control link (15) kinematically connected to the slide rod guides the change lever into the carrier's rotary circle. The control link is in the form of a slide piece coupled with the slide rod in the lock housing (2). The slide piece has a control slot (16) into which fits a pin (17) of the change lever. The control slot intersects the lever and raises the lever by means of the pin from the carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00; E05B 59/00; E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974721 A2 20000126; EP 0974721 A3 20021113; EP 0974721 B1 20050309; AT 406496 B 20000525; AT A127698 A 19991015; DE 59911721 D1 20050414; ES 2237903 T3 20050801

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911721

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENT-, DE

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911721

- Representative's name: KOTITSCHKE & HEURUNG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2014-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911721

- Representative's name: DR. RALF KOTITSCHKE, DE

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120624

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROTO FRANK EISENWARENFABRIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060624

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050625

2006-06-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060624

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237903 T3

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911721 P 20050414

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: SI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/00 A, 7E 05B 59/00 B, 7E 05C 9/02 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI