Global Patent Index - EP 0974722 A2

EP 0974722 A2 2000-01-26 - Lock with several bolts

Title (en)

Lock with several bolts

Title (de)

Mehrriegelverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure à plusieurs pênes

Publication

EP 0974722 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890213 A

Priority

AT 127398 A

Abstract (en)

A cog wheel (9) of the gear, preferably the driving cog wheel directly or by means of pins fitting into the slide rod cogging, caries a carrier (18) on its flat side. A ring (19) is mounted on the same axis of the cog wheel and is held by the carrier. The ring has a carrier surface (22) in whose rotary circle a contact point of the change lever (13) is swiveled. An annular surface next to the carrier surface ejects the lever from the contact position.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mehrriegelverschluss mit Schließzylinderbetätigung und Getriebe weist zur Fallenbetätigung einen Wechselhebel (13) auf. Das abtreibende Zahnrad (9) des Getriebes wirkt über einen Mitnehmer (18) auf einen koaxialen drehbar gelagerten Ring (19), der gegenüber dem Mitnehmer einen Freiwinkel aufweist. Der Ring (19) trägt seinerseits eine Mitnehmerfläche (22), die auf den etwa tangential am Ring (19) unter Federvorspannung anliegenden Wechselhebel (13) bei einer Weiterdrehung nach dem Aufsperrvorgang einwirken. Durch Anheben des Wechselhebels (13) schwenkt ein Winkelhebel (14) um und zieht die Falle (12) über eine Stift (17)-Schlitzverbindung (15) ein. Es führt der Ring (19) eine geringere Winkelbewegung aus als das Zahnrad (9), sodass es nicht bei jeder Umdrehung des Zahnrades (9), sondern nur einmal im Anschluss an das Aufsperren zu einem Fallenrückzug über den Wechselhebel (13) kommt. Die am Wechselhebel (13) angreifende Feder (25) kann gleichzeitig als Fallenfeder ausgebildet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00; E05B 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974722 A2 20000126; EP 0974722 A3 20021113; EP 0974722 B1 20040609; AT 406285 B 20000327; AT A127398 A 19990815; DE 59909674 D1 20040715

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909674

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120629

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080629

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080629

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK EISENWARENFABRIK A.G.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909674 P 20040715

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: RO

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: SI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/00 A, 7E 05B 59/00 B, 7E 05C 9/02 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI