Global Patent Index - EP 0974723 A2

EP 0974723 A2 2000-01-26 - Lock with several bolts

Title (en)

Lock with several bolts

Title (de)

Mehrriegelschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure à plusieurs pênes

Publication

EP 0974723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890246 A

Priority

  • AT 127298 A
  • AT 176998 A

Abstract (en)

The cog wheel gear is between the cylinder and cogging on a slide rod or slide rod connecting slide. The outer tooth flank (10) of the first and or last (8,9) tooth of the slide rod or connecting slide cogging (6), for engaging with the driving cog wheel (1) or tooth-pins (2',3') of this cog wheel or the cog wheel gear, is staggered in position in relation to the center line of the tooth (8,9). Alternatively the tooth flank has an undercut (10) pointing towards the center line for inserting the tooth or tooth pin engaging with it.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mehrriegelschloss mit Zylinderbetätigung und einem Zahnradgetriebe zwischen dem Zylinder und einer Schubstange oder einem Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (6) umfasst als Schubstangengetriebe eine Verzahnung auf einer Schubstange oder den Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (6). Die außen liegenden Zahnflanken des ersten und bzw. oder letzten Zahnes (8, 9) weisen eine zur Mittellinie dieser Zähne gerichtete Hinterschneidung (10, 11) auf bzw. sind über die ganze Höhe abgeflacht, wobei ein Zahn des zugeordneten Zahnrades oder ein Stift (2, 3; 2', 3') bei Stiftverzahnung, in die Hinterschneidung (10, 11) eintaucht und dabei trotz Drehung des Zahnrades (1) gegenüber dem Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (6) freigestellt ist, also keine Längsverschiebung bewirkt. Der Querschnitt des Zahnstiftes (2', 3') des Zahnrades (1) entspricht etwa einem gleichseitigen oder gleichschenkeligen Dreieck, insbesondere einem Gleichdick. Jeweils eine Seite der Querschnittsform von zwei diametral zueinander vorgesehenen Stiften (2', 3') liegen einander unmittelbar gegenüber und schließen mit dem Durchmesser einen rechten Winkel ein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/12; E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974723 A2 20000126; EP 0974723 A3 20031119; EP 0974723 B1 20050907; DE 59912519 D1 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110701

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090722

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090722

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-09-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040505

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/12 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05C 9/02 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI