Global patent index - EP 0974725 A2

EP 0974725 A2 2000-01-26 - Composite part

Title (en)

Composite part

Title (de)

Verbundteil

Title (fr)

Pièce composite

Publication

EP 0974725 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114359 A

Priority

DE 19833032 A

Abstract (en)

The two side parts (11,12) and at least two spaced apart covering parts (14,15) form a space between them filled with plastic foam and containing at least one reinforcement (23) in the form of an elongated band resting against the side parts. The reinforcement contains differently sized holes.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verbundteil mit Seitenteilen (11,12) und Deckelementen (14,15), die gemeinsam mit den Seitenteilen einen Zwischenraum bilden, der mit Kunststoff ausgeschäumt ist, ergibt sich ein verbesserter Verformungswiderstand durch wenigstens ein Versteifungselement (23) im Zwischenraum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/70; E04C 2/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/82 (2006.01); E06B 5/11 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/24 (2013.01); E06B 3/825 (2013.01); E06B 5/11 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7023 (2013.01); E06B 2003/703 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7046 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3428035 A1 19860130 - PLENK ANTON

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974725 A2 20000126; EP 0974725 A3 20010509; DE 19833032 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011110

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI