Global patent index - EP 0974731 A2

EP 0974731 A2 2000-01-26 - Method and apparatus for solution mining in an inclined reservoir

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for solution mining in an inclined reservoir

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aussolung geneigter Lagerstätten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'exploitation par dissolution d'un reservoir incliné

Publication

EP 0974731 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111295 A

Priority

DE 19831234 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a vertical bore hole connected to a second bore hole (2), which follows the inclination of the mineral deposit layer, with injection of a separately guide blanket medium (7) and extraction of the salt via the vertical bore hole. The salt level within the salt cavity is continuously measured and used for retraction of the end of the second bore hole, before the extraction process is repeated. An Independent claim for a mineral salt extraction device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur Aussolung von Lagerstätten sieht vor, daß ein Hohlraum mittels einer komplettierten Bohrung (1) gesolt wird und mindestens eine weitere Bohrung (2), die zumindest partiell dem Einfallen der Lagerstätte folgt, abgeteuft und komplettiert wird, wobei zwischen dem über der Bohrung (1) geschaffenen Hohlraum und mindestens einer weiteren Bohrung (2) eine Verbindung geschaffen wird und daß zur Abdeckung der in diesem Hohlraum (9) befindlichen Sole ein von der Sole getrennt geführtes Blanket-Medium (7) in den Hohlraum eingeleitet wird, wobei dieses Blanket-Medium (7) über die Bohrungen (1) und (2), welche mittels einer Blanket-Rohrleitung (22) verbunden sind, in einem pneumatisch-hydraulischen Verbund geführt wird, wobei das Niveau des Solespiegels in dem gesolten Hohlraum gemessen wird und daß nach Erreichen einer definierten Abbaumenge des Rohstoffes die Komplettierung oder ein Teil der Komplettierung der weiteren Bohrung (2) um einen definierten Betrag zurückgezogen und der Solvorgang erneut begonnen wird, wobei die Sole über die Rohrtour der Bohrung (1) abgeführt und das obere Niveau dieses weiteren Abbauhohlraumes im wesentlichen durch die Lage des Blanket-Mediums (7) oberhalb des Solespiegels bestimmt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/28 (2006.01); E21C 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/28 (2013.01); E21C 41/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831234 A1 20000113; DE 19831234 C2 20020516; EP 0974731 A2 20000126; EP 0974731 A3 20010613; EP 0974731 B1 20031217; ES 2213314 T3 20040816

INPADOC legal status

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080611

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080611

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-06-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-05-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060511

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2213314

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59908069

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040129

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAVERNEN BAU- UND BETRIEBS-GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR NL

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI