Global Patent Index - EP 0974742 A3

EP 0974742 A3 2001-04-25 - Control of a cooling circuit for a motorised vehicle

Title (en)

Control of a cooling circuit for a motorised vehicle

Title (de)

Regelung eines Kühlkreislaufes eines motorgetriebenen Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Commande d'un circuit de refroidissement d'un véhicule motorisé

Publication

EP 0974742 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111701 A

Priority

DE 19832626 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974742A2] The cooling circuit of a motor vehicle is controlled and altered according to the determined position of the vehicle and its forthcoming position, according to the road it is traveling on. For example if the vehicle is approaching a hill the cooling capacity is increased before the hill is reached. The current position is determined using a GPS receiver and the navigational system includes a CD-ROM with roads and associated data for example altitude variations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/167 (2013.01); F01P 2025/60 (2013.01); F01P 2025/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974742 A2 20000126; EP 0974742 A3 20010425; EP 0974742 B1 20040512; DE 19832626 C1 20000316; ES 2219953 T3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-01-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: DAIMLER AG

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219953 T3

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI