Global Patent Index - EP 0974787 A2

EP 0974787 A2 2000-01-26 - Lamp, housing member in particular for a lamp and fastening device for mounting a functional member in the housing member

Title (en)

Lamp, housing member in particular for a lamp and fastening device for mounting a functional member in the housing member

Title (de)

Lampenkopf, Gehäuseteil insbesondere für einen Lampenkof sowie Befestigungseinrichtung zur Anbringung eines Funktionsteiles in dem Gehäuseteil

Title (fr)

Lampe, boîtier notamment pour une lampe et dispositif de fixation pour le montage d'un élément fonctionnel dans le boîtier

Publication

EP 0974787 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98117173 A

Priority

DE 19833018 A

Abstract (en)

The casing part includes a main body, a space formed in the main body for receiving at least one component, and an insertion aperture, especially for inserting the component into the reception space. A through-put area is provided, through which the component in the reception space is connected with a supply arrangement, especially a voltage source. The main body is formed from an elastic, soft material, and is provided with a passage aperture in the through-put area, in which a socket element is arranged in a sealed manner.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gehäuseteil (1) insbesondere einen Lampenkopf mit einem Grundkörper (2), einem in dem Grundkörper ausgebildeten Aufnahmeraum (15) zur Aufnahme wenigstens eines Funktionsteiles (7), einer Einsatzöffnung insbesondere zum Einsetzen des Funktionsteiles in den Aufnahmeraum, und einem Durchführungsbereich (3) über weichen das zum Einsatz in den Aufnahmeraum (15) vorgesehene Funktionsteil (7) mit einer Versorgungseinrichtung insbesondere einer Spannungsquelle verbindbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Grundkörper (2) aus einem elastisch verformbaren Weichstoffmaterial insbesondere Silikonkautschuk gebildet. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Formwerkzeug zur Herstellung eines derartigen Lampenkopfes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 15/00; B29C 45/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7037 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2101/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974787 A2 20000126; EP 0974787 A3 20011121

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 15/00 A, 7B 29C 45/44 B, 7F 21V 15/04 B, 7F 21V 15/01 B, 7F 21V 23/04 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI