Global Patent Index - EP 0974794 A2

EP 0974794 A2 2000-01-26 - Refrigerator with evaporator positioned within the preservation compartment roof

Title (en)

Refrigerator with evaporator positioned within the preservation compartment roof

Title (de)

Kühlschrank mit in der Decke des Bewahrungsfaches angeordenetem Verdampfer

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur avec un évaporateur situé dans le plafond du compartiment de conservation

Publication

EP 0974794 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113311 A

Priority

IT MI981693 A

Abstract (en)

A refrigerator with at least one preservation compartment (3) cooled by evaporator means (4, 5) which comprise a part (5) positioned in correspondence with the roof (6) of the preservation compartment (3) and transmitting its cold to said compartment via a eutectic layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 11/00; F25D 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 11/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/061 (2013.01); F25D 11/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974794 A2 20000126; EP 0974794 A3 20000712; EP 0974794 B1 20060913; DE 69933174 D1 20061026; DE 69933174 T2 20070920; ES 2273454 T3 20070501; IT MI981693 A1 20000124; IT MI981693 D0 19980722

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2273454

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69933174

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030228

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI