Global Patent Index - EP 0974795 A3

EP 0974795 A3 2000-02-02 - Sealing joint for a refrigerator door

Title (en)

Sealing joint for a refrigerator door

Title (de)

Abdichtungsvorrichtung für Kühlschranktür

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité pour porte de réfrigérateur

Publication

EP 0974795 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500127 A

Priority

ES 9801567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974795A2] The joint includes a head (1) where a housing (2) is formed for the location of magnetic strips, this head (1) being connected to a base (3) defining a fastening plate (6) against the door (5) of the refrigerator. The connection between the fastening base (6) and the head (1) is done by means of connecting walls (4) and (4'). There may be a vault-shaped reinforcing wall (8) that is connected by its ends to the plate (6), and on whose wall (8) the walls (4) and (4') are connected close to the connecting ends of said wall (8), which may be complemented with an inside reinforcing wall (9) between the fastening plate (6) and the reinforcing wall (8). The reinforcing wall (9) is projected from a point close to the center of the fastening plate (6) up to an area close to the connection between the wall (4') and the reinforcing wall (8). By means of said joint the opening and closing forces are distributed on the part of the surface of the fastening plate (6), pulling at the area of the ends of the arch that forms the reinforcing wall (8), with which the glued connection has more resistance against the separation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974795 A2 20000126; EP 0974795 A3 20000202; EP 0974795 B1 20051228; DE 69929121 D1 20060202; DE 69929121 T2 20060803; ES 2160010 A1 20011016; ES 2160010 B1 20020501; ES 2257020 T3 20060716

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150724

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69929121

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120725

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120724

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120724

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257020 T3

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929121 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI