Global patent index - EP 0974799 A2

EP 0974799 A2 2000-01-26 - Process for drying fibrous webs

Title (en)

Process for drying fibrous webs

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Trocknung von Faserstoffbahnen

Title (fr)

Procédé de séchage de bandes fibreuses

Publication

EP 0974799 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105158 A

Priority

DE 19827843 A

Abstract (en)

To dry a wet fiber web (1), especially of paper or cardboard or tissue, it is heated, and the drying action is set across the web at least in sections at least during one phase of the heating process. The drying effect is varied at the center of the web (1), in relation to the edges, so that the blowing and/or heating is stronger at the center while the edges are moistened. The changing effects on the heating action are decreased towards the end of the drying process, across the web (1) width. The heating effect action is stronger and/or the strongest at the start of the heating program, and after the contained water has started to evaporate. The level of the heating effect is set by the difference between the shrinkage of the web (1) at the heating point and the shrinkage at the end of the drying process. An independent claim is included for an appts. where the web (1) is subjected to blowing and/or moistening and/or heating at a different intensity at least in sections, across the web (1) width.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Trocknung von Faserstoffbahnen, insbesondere Papier-, Karton- oder Tissuebahnen, bei dem die Faserstoffbahn aufgeheizt wird. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es dabei ein Trocknungsverfahren zu schaffen, bei dem ein möglichst ebenes Querprofil des Flächengewichts selbst nach relativ kurzen Trocknungsvorgängen gewährleistet ist. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, daß zumindest während einer Phase des Trocknungsvorganges der Grad der Trocknung wenigstens abschnittsweise quer zur Faserstoffbahn (1) beeinflusst wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21G 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/021 (2013.01); D21F 5/042 (2013.01); D21G 7/00 (2013.01); F26B 13/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827843 A1 19991230; EP 0974799 A2 20000126; EP 0974799 A3 20011205

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI