Global Patent Index - EP 0974808 A1

EP 0974808 A1 2000-01-26 - Transmitter unit for measuring instrument

Title (en)

Transmitter unit for measuring instrument

Title (de)

Sendeeinheit für Messinstrument

Title (fr)

Unité de transmission pour un appareil de mesure

Publication

EP 0974808 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305404 A

Priority

GB 9815892 A

Abstract (en)

A main unit (21) attached onto rear side (opposite to a side equipped with a digital display) of a slider (14) and accommodating a transmission circuit inside to transmit measurement data by wireless, and an attachment module (40) to retain the main unit attachably and detachably to the slider are provided. Front profile of the main unit (21) is formed at least not to protrude beyond front profile of the slider. The attachment module (40) is constituted to be plugged into and unplugged from an output connector (18) on the slider (14), and has a connector (44) to connect the output connector and the transmission circuit in the main unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 3/20; G01D 11/24; G08C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 3/20 (2006.01); G01B 21/00 (2006.01); G01D 11/24 (2006.01); G08C 17/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 3/205 (2013.01); G01D 11/24 (2013.01); G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G01B 2210/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974808 A1 20000126; EP 0974808 B1 20030917; CN 1193559 C 20050316; CN 1247427 A 20000315; DE 69911326 D1 20031023; DE 69911326 T2 20050804; GB 2339913 A 20000209; GB 2339913 B 20021023; GB 9815892 D0 19980916; JP 2000076577 A 20000314; JP 4456697 B2 20100428; US 6502057 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911326 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020826

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI