Global Patent Index - EP 0974856 A3

EP 0974856 A3 2000-11-02 - Fiber optic header with integrated power monitor

Title (en)

Fiber optic header with integrated power monitor

Title (de)

Faseroptisches Modul mit integriertem Leistungsmonitor

Title (fr)

Tête à fibre optique avec moniteur de puissance intégré

Publication

EP 0974856 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99113830 A

Priority

US 11908998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0974856A2] An optical header for coupling a light source (102) to an optical fiber (101) is disclosed. The header preferably includes a substrate (100) that has a recess (102A) for a vertical cavity surface emitting laser (VCSEL), or alternatively an edge emitting laser. An optical fiber (101) is preferably attached to the substrate (100) and terminates at the light source (102). The end (101A) of the fiber (101) is preferably cleaved or polished to an angle such that light entering the fiber from the light source (102) is substantially reflected into the fiber (101). A reflective coating (105) is placed on the cleaved end (101A) of the fiber thereby permitting a small percentage of light to radiate away from the fiber (101) and toward an detector (103). The light preferably travels to the detector (103) through a transmission medium such as a prism (104) or an optical-grade epoxy. The header is particularly useful when used in conjunction with multiple fibers simultaneously to form an optical fiber array. The header is also useful to house an optical receiver, or to form a bi-directional header suitable for fiber optic communications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/4246 (2013.01); G02B 6/4214 (2013.01); G02B 6/4249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974856 A2 20000126; EP 0974856 A3 20001102; US 6081638 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060707

2005-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINISAR CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI