Global patent index - EP 0974869 A2

EP 0974869 A2 2000-01-26 - Process cartridge and electrophotographic apparatus

Title (en)

Process cartridge and electrophotographic apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahrenskassette und elektrophotographischer Apparat

Title (fr)

Cartouche de traitement et appareil électrophotographique

Publication

EP 0974869 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99401819 A

Priority

JP 20526598 A

Abstract (en)

An electrophotographic photosensitive member is constituted by a support and a photosensitive layer disposed on the support. The electrophotographic photosensitive member has a surface layer comprising a polyester resin having a recurring unit represented by the following formula (1): <CHEM> wherein A1 represents a substituted or unsubstituted divalent aliphatic hydrocarbon group. The resultant surface layer is effective in improving an abrasive resistance of the photosensitive member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/147

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/05 (2006.01); G03G 5/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/056 (2013.01); G03G 5/14752 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974869 A2 20000126; EP 0974869 A3 20000419; EP 0974869 B1 20061227; DE 69934550 D1 20070208; DE 69934550 T2 20071004; US 6185398 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69934550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20070208

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PROCESS CARTRIDGE AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PROCESS CARTRIDGE AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050502

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7G 03G 5/147 A, 7G 03G 5/05 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI