Global patent index - EP 0974903 A2

EP 0974903 A2 2000-01-26 - Method and apparatus for providing failure detection and recovery with predetermined replication style for distributed applications in a network

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for providing failure detection and recovery with predetermined replication style for distributed applications in a network

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fehlererkennung und Wiederherstellung mit vorbestimmtem Replikationsgrad für verteilte Anwendungen in einem Netzwerk

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour détection de défaillance et recouvrement avec degré prédéterminé de réplication pour des applications distribuées dans un réseau

Publication

EP 0974903 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305515 A

Priority

US 11913998 A

Abstract (en)

An application module (A) running on a host computer in a computer network is failure-protected with one or more backup copies that are operative on other host computers in the network. In order to effect fault protection, the application module registers itself with a ReplicaManager daemon process (112) by sending a registration message, which message, in addition to identifying the registering application module and the host computer on which it is running, includes the particular replication strategy (cold backup, warm backup, or hot backup) and the degree of replication associated with that application module. The backup copies are then maintained in a fail-over state according to the registered replication strategy. A WatchDog daemon (113), running on the same host computer as the registered application periodically monitors the registered application to detect failures. When a failure, such as a crash or hangup of the application module, is detected, the failure is reported to the ReplicaManager, which effects the requested fail-over actions. An additional backup copy is then made operative in accordance with the registered replication style and the registered degree of replication. A SuperWatchDog daemon process (115-1), running on the same host computer as the ReplicaManager, monitors each host computer in the computer network. When a host failure is detected, each application module running on that host computer is individually failure-protected in accordance with its registered replication style and degree of replication. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/177 (2006.01); G06F 11/00 (2006.01); G06F 11/14 (2006.01); G06F 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/2097 (2013.01); G06F 11/1438 (2013.01); G06F 11/2023 (2013.01); G06F 11/0757 (2013.01); G06F 11/2038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974903 A2 20000126; EP 0974903 A3 20010613; EP 0974903 B1 20030514; AU 4020299 A 20000210; AU 752844 B2 20021003; CA 2273523 A1 20000120; CA 2273523 C 20030318; DE 69907818 D1 20030618; DE 69907818 T2 20040304; JP 2000105754 A 20000411; KR 20000011835 A 20000225; US 6266781 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-21 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RG

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-05-16 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20140410

2013-12-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20131122

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-08-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907818

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHUNG, PI-YU

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HUANG, YENNUN

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIANG, DERON

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SHIH, CHIA-YEN

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YAJNIK, SHALINI

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI