Global Patent Index - EP 0974937 A1

EP 0974937 A1 2000-01-26 - Printing and recording module for a transport ticket

Title (en)

Printing and recording module for a transport ticket

Title (de)

Module zum Drucken und Aufzeichnen eines Fahrscheines

Title (fr)

Module d'impression et d'enregistrement d'un ticket de transport

Publication

EP 0974937 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401861 A

Priority

FR 9809453 A

Abstract (en)

The module is incorporated into a ticket dispensing device which delivers paper from reels via openings (2,3,4) driven by free and Motorized rollers (6,7) to a cutting mechanism (8). The ticket may be magnetically registered (12) and verified by a magnetic controller unit (13) with ticket information printed by the thermal unit (16). The ticket is delivered to the outlet (17) by Motorized and free rollers (14,15). The mechanisms are housed in a mechanical chassis (21) with side opening door (30). A series of optical detectors (22,23,24,25,26,27) are mounted on the inside of the door and linked to an electronic circuit (31) mounted on the outside of the door. The detectors monitor the movement of the paper and ticket around the module and are automatically actuated when the door is closed.

Abstract (fr)

Module d'impression et d'enregistrement magnétique destiné à être incorporé à un dispositif d'élaboration et de délivrance d'un titre de transport, caractérisé en ce que l'ensemble des moyens d'entraînement mécanique (6, 7 - 9, 10 - 14, 16) du ticket et des moyens d'enregistrement magnétique (12), d'impression thermique (16) et de contrôle (13) est disposé sur un chassis (20) dont le contour forme un cadre (21), alors que l'ensemble des circuits électriques et électroniques ainsi que des moyens détecteurs de présence (22, 23, 24, 25, 26, 27) du ticket est disposé sur une porte d'accès et de fermeture (30) articulé du chassis (20), de manière à dissocier les fonctions électriques ou électroniques des autres fonctions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 1/00; G07B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 1/00 (2006.01); G07B 5/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 1/00 (2013.01); G07B 5/00 (2013.01); G07F 17/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 9403659 A 19940329

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974937 A1 20000126; EP 0974937 B1 20021218; DE 69904537 D1 20030130; FR 2781590 A1 20000128; FR 2781590 B1 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMES

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2004-09-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904537 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904537 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 1/00 A, 7G 07B 5/00 B

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTING AND RECORDING MODULE FOR A TRANSPORT TICKET

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 1/00 A, 7G 07B 5/00 B

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTING AND RECORDING MODULE FOR A TRANSPORT TICKET

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 1/00 A, 7G 07B 5/00 B

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRINTING AND RECORDING MODULE FOR A TRANSPORT TICKET

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-02-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERRAD, FRANCOIS

2000-02-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GAUTHEROT, DANIEL

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI