Global patent index - EP 0974946 A2

EP 0974946 A2 2000-01-26 - Optical communication system for utility meters

Title (en)

Optical communication system for utility meters

Title (de)

Optisches-übertragungssystem für Verbrauchzählern

Title (fr)

System de communication optique pour compteurs de consommation

Publication

EP 0974946 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114445 A

Priority

  • GB 9815945 A
  • GB 9815943 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an improved optical communication system for gas or electricity meters. The system comprises a transmitter and a receiver disposed on a utility meter, and a further transmitter and receiver disposed on a receiver unit. The utility meter transmitter is arranged to transmit a data signal and a further signal to the receiver unit, with the further signal having a pulse width greater than a pulse width of the data signal. The receiver unit further comprises a separation means for separating the data signal and the further signal based on pulse width. The further signal may contain calibration information or be used to link the meter to external equipment. The present invention advantageously allows for a reduction in component parts while enhancing the functionality of the meter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 23/04; G08C 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/04 (2013.01); G08C 2201/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974946 A2 20000126; EP 0974946 A3 20050413; GB 2339986 A 20000209; GB 9917108 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status

2011-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110201

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-04-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANDIS+GYR LIMITED

2006-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries concerned: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08C 19/22 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08C 23/04 A

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI