Global patent index - EP 0974947 A1

EP 0974947 A1 2000-01-26 - Traffic light apparatus and method to monitor the traffic light apparatus

Title (en)

Traffic light apparatus and method to monitor the traffic light apparatus

Title (de)

Lichtsignalanlage sowie Verfahren zum Überwachen der Lichtsignalanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil de signalisation lumineuse et procédé de contrôle de l'appareil de signalisation

Publication

EP 0974947 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113241 A

Priority

DE 19833209 A

Abstract (en)

A light signal unit has at least one signal generator (1) whose light-source is designed in the form of a matrix of light-emitting diodes (LEDs) (6). Also included is a monitoring device (2,7,9) for checking the LEDs for their fault-free operating condition. The monitor has a light sensing device (7), as well as an evaluating device (3) connected to the light sensor (7) for comparing a light sensing signal (57) generated by the light sensor with a given desired value, the light sensing device (7) being positioned in the beam-path of the LEDs (6). The given desired value corresponds to a normal operating state of the LEDs.

Abstract (de)

Die Lichtsignalanlage ist mit mindestens einem Signalgeber (1) ausgestattet, dessen Lichtquelle durch in Form einer Matrix angeordnete Leuchtdioden (6) gebildet ist. Sicherheitsanforderungen an Lichtsignalanlagen, insbesondere für den öffentlichen Verkehr, bedingen eine Überwachungseinrichtung (2, 7, 9) zum periodischen Überprüfen des/der Signalgeber (1) auf deren fehlerfreien Betrieb. Dazu weist die Überwachungseinrichtung einen im Strahlengang der Leuchtdioden (6) angeordneten Lichtsensor (7) sowie eine mit diesem verbundene Auswerteeinrichtung (3) auf. Diese wertet ein durch den Lichtsensor (7)erzeugtes Lichtsensorsignal (s7) als den Istzustand des Signalgebers (1) aus. Durch Vergleichen mit vorgegebenen Sollwerten, die jeweils einem aktuellen Sollzustand (<IMAGE>ein/"aus")des Signalgebers (1) entsprechen, werden Fehlzustände festgestellt. Im Fehlerfall wird der Signalgeber (1) durch eine mit der Auswerteeinrichtung (3) verbundene, ein Signalprogramm für die angeschlossenen Signalgeber enthaltende Gerätesteuerung (4) in einen definierten Ausfallzustand rückgesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2006.01); H05B 33/08 (2006.01); H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0803 (2013.01); G08G 1/095 (2013.01); H05B 33/0818 (2013.01); H05B 33/0893 (2013.01); H05B 37/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974947 A1 20000126; EP 0974947 B1 20041215; AT 285103 T 20050115

INPADOC legal status

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090706

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-04-30 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-10-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-07-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIGNALBAU HUBER GMBH

2005-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIGNALBAU HUBER GMBH

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59911260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20050120

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI NL

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI