Global Patent Index - EP 0974950 A2

EP 0974950 A2 2000-01-26 - Article with anti-theft protection

Title (en)

Article with anti-theft protection

Title (de)

Gegenstand mit Diebstahlschutz

Title (fr)

Article avec protection anti-vol

Publication

EP 0974950 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99101084 A

Priority

DE 19832761 A

Abstract (en)

The marking material applied to the outline of the marking is recognized or detected by special means. The marking has an edge which is not a pure circle, oblong or square and has an easily identifiable outline. The marking (6) has an inner (9) and outer (8) edge. The marking contains a logo (1,3), and consists of a print, varnish or template.

Abstract (de)

Zur Kennzeichnung von Betriebsmitteln gibt es visuell sichtbare sowie visuell nicht sichtbare Kennzeichnungsmittel, wobei zu den letzteren beispielsweise UV-Lacke gehören, die nur unter UV-Licht sichtbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß wird auf einen zu kennzeichnenden Gegenstand (2) ein Etikett (6) o.ä. gelegt, das ein Firmenlogo (3) darstellt. Das Etikett (6) hat hierbei Ausstanzungen, so daß das Markierungsmittel (4) beim Übermalen der äußeren (8) und inneren (9) Ränder des Etiketts (6) das Logo unsichtbar auf der Oberfläche (7) des Gegenstandes (2) abbildet. Auch nach einem Entfernen des Etiketts (6) bleibt (bei 1) das Logo als nicht markierte Oberfläche (5) in dem unsichtbaren UV-Film (4) zurück. Die Erfindung eignet sich zum sicheren Kennzeichnen von Betriebsmitteln gegen Diebstahl. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974950 A2 20000126; EP 0974950 A3 20020213; DE 19832761 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 09F 3/02 A, 7G 09F 3/00 B

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI