Global Patent Index - EP 0974980 A1

EP 0974980 A1 2000-01-26 - Flexible sheath for cable harness

Title (en)

Flexible sheath for cable harness

Title (de)

Biegsamer Ummantelung für Kabelbündel

Title (fr)

Gaine souple pour faisceau de câbles

Publication

EP 0974980 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401840 A

Priority

FR 9809413 A

Abstract (en)

The tape used to form the sleeve has edges cut in sinusoidal pattern. The flexible sleeve for bundles of cables initially comprises a band of flexible material (1) with two longitudinal edges (8,9) on either side of a longitudinal axis (2). The material is intended to be wrapped around the bundle of cables, and the two edges fastened together face to face. Both edges have a sinusoidal profile with projecting sections (4a,4b) alternating with cut-away sections (4c,4d). The projecting sections may be coated with a material making them self-adhesive. The inside and outside surfaces of the tape are clearly identified, ensuring that the tape is correctly wrapped around the bundle of cables when fitted to them.

Abstract (fr)

La gaine (6) souple pour faisceau de câbles susceptible d'être fixée sur un support (5) est constituée à partir d'une bande de matériau souple (1) dont les deux lisières longitudinales (8) et (9) sont réunies par leur face interne après logement du faisceau de câbles (7) sur ladite bande et enroulement de cette dernière autour d'un axe longitudinal, chaque lisière (8) et (9) comprenant des parties pleines (4a, 4b) et des parties en creux (4c, 4d) et en ce que les parties pleines (4a, 4b) d'une lisière (8) ou (9) sont en regard de parties en creux (4c, 4d) de l'autre lisière. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974980 A1 20000126; FR 2781599 A1 20000128; FR 2781599 B1 20011109

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASTO SA

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASTO POLYMERES ET ADHESIFS

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI