Global patent index - EP 0974989 A1

EP 0974989 A1 2000-01-26 - Manufacturing method of an electrode and use of such a method to manufacture an electrode in an electrolytic capacitor or a battery

Title (en)

Manufacturing method of an electrode and use of such a method to manufacture an electrode in an electrolytic capacitor or a battery

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Elektrode sowie Verwendung dieses Verfahrens zur Herstellung einer Elektrode in einem Elektrolytkondensator oder einer Batterie

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'une électrode et utilisation de cette méthode pour la fabrication d'une électrode dans un condensateur électrolytique ou une batterie

Publication

EP 0974989 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107950 A

Priority

DE 19832355 A

Abstract (en)

An impermeable electrode is produced by depositing graphite from organic suspension onto a substrate, drying and heat treating to form an impermeable graphite layer. An impermeable electrode is produced by depositing an impermeable conductive graphite layer from a 1-50 g/l graphite suspension in an organic solvent onto a substrate by immersion e.g. for 10-60 sec., drying the coated substrate at 80-150 degrees C e.g. for 1 min. and heat treating at 200-450 degrees C e.g., for 5-60 min.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer undurchlässigen Elektrode für Elektrolytkondensatoren, Superkondensatoren oder Batterien, wobei eine undurchlässige leitende Schicht aus Graphit, welche aus einer Graphit in einer Konzentration zwischen 1 und 50 g/l in einem organischen Lösungsmittel enthaltenden Suspension auf einer Unterlage durch Eintauchen für eine vorgegebene Zeit von z.B. etwa 10 bis 60 Sekunden abgeschieden wird und wobei die Unterlage mit der Schicht aus Graphit nach dem Abscheiden bei einer Temperatur zwischen etwa 80 und 150°C für eine vorgegebene Zeit von z.B. etwa 1 Minute getrocknet und nach dem Trocknen bei einer Temperatur zwischen etwa 200 und 450°C für eine vorgegebene Zeit von z.B. etwa 5 bis 60 Minuten wärmebehandelt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01G 9/042; H01G 9/058; H01M 4/58; H01M 4/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/00 (2006.01); H01G 9/04 (2006.01); H01G 9/042 (2006.01); H01G 9/155 (2006.01); H01M 4/133 (2010.01); H01M 4/1393 (2010.01); H01M 4/66 (2006.01); H01M 4/96 (2006.01); H01M 10/052 (2010.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/155 (2013.01); H01G 9/042 (2013.01); H01M 4/133 (2013.01); H01M 4/1393 (2013.01); H01M 4/663 (2013.01); H01M 4/667 (2013.01); H01M 4/96 (2013.01); H01M 10/052 (2013.01); Y02E 60/122 (2013.01); Y02E 60/13 (2013.01); Y02E 60/50 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49115 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49224 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5158843 A
  • [A] EP 0470563 A1
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 199806 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L03, AN 1998-061786 XP002119143 & RU 2 080 678 C (VORON RADIO PARTS WKS STOCK CO), 27. Mai 1997 (1997-05-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974989 A1 20000126; EP 0974989 B1 20051123; DE 59912814 D1 20051229; US 2002061362 A1 20020523; US 6428842 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070422

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070422

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070422

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-04-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59912814

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20051229

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: MANUFACTURING METHOD OF AN ELECTRODE AND USE OF SUCH A METHOD TO MANUFACTURE AN ELECTRODE IN AN ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR O

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI