Global patent index - EP 0974992 A1

EP 0974992 A1 2000-01-26 - Electric pressure switch

Title (en)

Electric pressure switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Druckschalter

Title (fr)

Commutateur éléctrique à pression

Publication

EP 0974992 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108117 A

Priority

DE 19833171 A

Abstract (en)

The switching plate (2) is carried on a system of two balls (7, 8) guided in a ball cage (9) along grooves formed by the casing walls. Each ball is also loaded against two support walls of the plate. The casing walls include contacts (18, 19, 20, 21), short circuited by the balls.

Abstract (de)

Bekannte Druckschalter sind sehr kompliziert aufgebaut. Hiergegen weist der neue Druckschalter die Merkmale auf, daß der Schalterschieber (2) auf wenigstens zwei Kugeln (7,8) gelagert ist, die in einem Kugelkäfig (9) geführt jede in einer Gehäuserille (10, 11) rollen, die von zwei Abstützwänden (12, 13 und 14, 15) gebildet ist, gegen die die Kugeln (7, 8) unter der Auflagekraft jeweils einer Abstützwand (16, 17) des Schaltschiebers (2) belastet sind, und daß die Abstützwände (12, 13 und 14, 15) des Gehäuses Kontaktsegmente (18, 19) und Kontaktbahnen (20, 21) aufweisen, die von wenigstens einer der Kugeln (7, 8) in einer der Schaltstellungen kurzgeschlossen sind. Der neue Druckschalter läßt sich leicht schalten und weist eine hohe Kontaktkraft auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/56; H01H 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/16 (2006.01); H01H 13/12 (2006.01); H01H 13/56 (2006.01); H01H 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/16 (2013.01); H01H 13/12 (2013.01); H01H 13/562 (2013.01); H01H 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4301192 C1 19940203 - PREH ELEKTRO FEINMECHANIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833171 C1 19991125; EP 0974992 A1 20000126; EP 0974992 B1 20030212; ES 2190146 T3 20030716

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040426

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040424

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040424

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190146

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904260

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI