Global patent index - EP 0974994 A1

EP 0974994 A1 2000-01-26 - Electromagnet for automatic circuit breaker having a flat core with twisted portion

Title (en)

Electromagnet for automatic circuit breaker having a flat core with twisted portion

Title (de)

Elektromagnet für einen Leitungsschutzschalter mit einem flachen Kern mit einem verdrillten Teil

Title (fr)

Electro-aimant pour un interrupteur automatique avec un noyau plat avec une partie torsadée

Publication

EP 0974994 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830450 A

Priority

EP 98830450 A

Abstract (en)

Electromagnet (150) for an automatic circuit breaker, comprising a substantially flat open core (160) and a winding (165) disposed around the core (160) to create a magnetic field, in which the core (160) has a first portion (215a) which is twisted with respect to a remaining second portion (210, 215b) about a line of development (205) of the core (160), such that the first portion (215a) is disposed in a plane intersecting the second portion (210, 215b), the winding (165) being disposed around the first portion (215a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/36; H01H 71/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/36 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/36 (2013.01); H01H 71/2472 (2013.01); H01H 71/2454 (2013.01); H01H 2050/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0974994 A1 20000126; EP 0974994 B1 20051221

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150723

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2005-09-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI