Global Patent Index - EP 0975001 A3

EP 0975001 A3 2000-03-01 - Plasma display panel and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Plasma display panel and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Plasma-Anzeigetafel und Herstellungsverfahren derselben

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage à plasma et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0975001 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99114333 A

Priority

  • JP 20600598 A
  • JP 29824398 A
  • JP 30818498 A
  • JP 30818698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0975001A2] A plasma display panel ("PDP") is provided with a protrusion (23) lower than barrier ribs (21) on an inner surface of a back plate substrate (20) and a phosphor layer (22) formed on a rib surface within a unitary emission unit including a surface of the protrusion, thereby realizing the PDP of high brightness, high luminous efficiency and long operating life. Also, the PDP has a structure, in which a portion of the inner surface of the substrate (10) is opened to a discharge space directly or through a protective layer, so as to improve power consumption remarkably. Further, the invention provides a production of the PDP with superior whiteness by way of controlling a balance of each color with shape of the respective protrusions. Moreover, an electrode can be formed easily and precisely on an upper part of the protrusion by providing a sloped surface for at least one end in a longitudinal direction of the protrusion. As a result, the invention provides the PDP that is of lower power consumption, high brightness, high luminous efficiency, and is capable of performing a speedy and stable electric-discharge and displaying white color of high color temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 17/49 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/26 (2013.01); H01J 11/34 (2013.01); H01J 11/38 (2013.01); H01J 11/44 (2013.01); H01J 2211/444 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975001 A2 20000126; EP 0975001 A3 20000301; EP 0975001 B1 20040428; DE 69916718 D1 20040603; DE 69916718 T2 20050421; DE 69920294 D1 20041021; DE 69920294 T2 20051117; EP 1296347 A2 20030326; EP 1296347 A3 20030402; EP 1296347 B1 20040915; US 2002195936 A1 20021226; US 6670757 B2 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070721

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070721

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69916718

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020712

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI