Global patent index - EP 0975003 A1

EP 0975003 A1 2000-01-26 - Colour television or colour monitor with flat screen

Title (en)

Colour television or colour monitor with flat screen

Title (de)

Farbfernsehgerät oder Farbmonitor mit flachem Bildschirm

Title (fr)

Téléviseur-couleur ou moniteur en couleur à écran plat

Publication

EP 0975003 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113322 A

Priority

EP 98113322 A

Abstract (en)

The cathode ray tube television/monitor has an electron lens system (49) for changing the separation between electron beams at a deflection unit (46) or electron gun (42) of the tube. An electron lens controller (48) controls the lens system according to deflection control signals (47) or synchronization pulses (44) of a video signal (40). The lens controller sets the beam separation according to an expression incorporating parameters determined by the dimensional structure of the cathode ray tube. The electron lens system is formed by a double magnetic quadrupole.

Abstract (de)

Farbfernsehgeräte und Farbmonitore werden mit einer Vorrichtung, insbesondere einem Elektronenlinsensystem, versehen, um den gegenseitigen Abstand der in einem Elektronenstrahlerzeugungssystem erzeugten Elektronenstrahlen zu verändern. Durch Verkleinerung des gegenseitigen Abstands der erzeugten Elektronenstrahlen in Abhängigkeit von der Ablenkung der Elektronenstrahlen kann der Abstand der Schattenmaske zum Leuchtschirm mit zunehmender Entfernung vom Schirmmittelpunkt entsprechend vergrößert werden und damit kann eine weniger aufwendige Maskenkonstruktion ohne Inkaufnahme der bisherigen Nachteile für einen flachen Bildschirm verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (examination)

WO 9744808 A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975003 A1 20000126; EP 0975003 B1 20030129; DE 59807070 D1 20030306; US 6483558 B1 20021119

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050716

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2005-01-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040830

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-07-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MT PICTURE DISPLAY GERMANY GMBH

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59807070

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030306

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA DISPLAY DEVICES (GERMANY) GMBH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990426

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI