Global patent index - EP 0975051 A1

EP 0975051 A1 2000-01-26 - Connector for coaxial cable with multiple start threads

Title (en)

Connector for coaxial cable with multiple start threads

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Koaxialkabel mit einem Mehrganggewinde

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble coaxial ayant un filetage à pas multiples

Publication

EP 0975051 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98113869 A

Priority

EP 98113869 A

Abstract (en)

Cable connector for coaxial cable, comprising a bushing (2) for providing an axial displacement of parts (4,5,6,7,8) in the connector, whereby these parts are brought into mechanical and/or electrical engagement with the coaxial cable. the axial displacement is provided by screwing a thread (10) provided on the bushing (2) onto a corresponding thread (9) provided on the main body (1) of the connector. By providing said threads (9,10) as multiple-start threads, it is achieved, that the assembly time can be substantially reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/053 (2013.01); H01R 9/0521 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975051 A1 20000126; US 6802738 B1 20041012

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000726;LT PAYMENT 20000726;LV PAYMENT 20000726;MK PAYMENT 20000726;RO PAYMENT 20000726;SI PAYMENT 20000726

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI