Global Patent Index - EP 0975052 A2

EP 0975052 A2 2000-01-26 - Electical connector having hybrid terminals

Title (en)

Electical connector having hybrid terminals

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit hybriden Anschlusselementen

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique avec des bornes de connexion hybrides

Publication

EP 0975052 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105146 A

Priority

DE 19832985 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has a second signal conductor receptacle which is in electrical contact with the first. The connector also has a second locking arrangement (5). The first locking arrangement (4) fixes the conductor end releasably. The second locking arrangement (5) fixes the conductor end in a non-releasable manner. The connector has at least one terminal element (2) for the contacting terminals of a signal conductor end (1). The element (2) is connected to a contact element (3) which can contact a terminal point. A first signal conductor receptacle receives the signal conductor end (1). A first locking arrangement (4) fixes the conductor end (1) in the receptacle and secures it against being pulled out.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung schafft eine Verbindungsvorrichtung, und insbesondere einen elektrischen Verbinder zum Anschluß eines Kabels an eine Stromübergabe, mit zumindest einem Anschlußelement (2) für den Anschluß eines Kabelendes (1), wobei das Anschlußelement (2) mit einem mit dem Anschlußpunkt kontaktierbaren Kontaktelement (3) verbunden ist und eine erste Kabelaufnahme, in die das Kabelende (1) einlegbar ist, sowie ein erstes Arretierungsmittel (4) aufweist, das das Kabelende (1) zur Herstellung einer Sicherung gegen Herausziehen fixiert. Bei den bekannten Verbindern werden Varianten mit lösbaren und Varianten mit nicht lösbaren Kabelanschlüssen gefertigt. Hierdurch erhöhen sich Teilevielfalt und Kosten, was die Erfindung vermeidet. Hierzu weist das Anschlußelement (2) eine mit der ersten in Kontakt stehende zweite Kabelaufnahme und ein zweites Arretierungsmittel (5) auf, wobei das erste Arretierungsmittel (4) das Kabelende lösbar und das zweite Arretierungsmittel (5) das Kabelende (1) nicht lösbar zu fixieren vermag. Hierdurch können beide Varianten mit gleichen Teilen gefertigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 11/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975052 A2 20000126; EP 0975052 A3 20010214; DE 19832985 A1 20000210; DE 19832985 C2 20020110

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020708

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI