Global Patent Index - EP 0975054 A2

EP 0975054 A2 2000-01-26 - High performance card edge connector

Title (en)

High performance card edge connector

Title (de)

Hochleistungsfähiger Leiterplattenrandverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur de bord de carte à haute performance

Publication

EP 0975054 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113364 A

Priority

  • US 12052798 A
  • US 12131698 A

Abstract (en)

A card edge connector for mounting on a circuit board (14) and removably receiving a circuit card (16) includes an elongated housing (26) defining a card receiving slot (34). Numerous terminal receiving cavities (44, 46) intersect and extend to both sides of the slot (34). Alternate cavities include stamped reference (ground or power) terminals (60) and signal terminals (62), all having downwardly extending board contacts (72, 92) and upwardly extending spring arms (76, 78; 96, 98). There are numerous similar sets of face to face contacts, each including a reference contact parallel to and substantially overlying an opposed pair of signal contacts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 12/72 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/688 (2013.01); H01R 12/721 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0975054 A2 20000126; EP 0975054 A3 20010919

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI